House | 02/15/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 290-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Prefiled. |