House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 052, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 052, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 730).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 03-28-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 359).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-24-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3303) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 234).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|