12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/17/2021 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Pending introduction. |