House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 164, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 164, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 03-29-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 360).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-28-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 238).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 785-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|