House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 165, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 165, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 25-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 25-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakashima, Costales, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-22 10:45AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-22 10:45AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-22 11:00AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 879).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Costales, Mizuno, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 726) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3837) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to LCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 239).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 944-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-16-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-16-22 at 9:30 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|