LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1510
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB1510
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB1510
Action History
House
01/31/2022
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-01-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
House
01/28/2022
Re-referred to EDN/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
House
01/28/2022
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
House
01/26/2022
Referred to EDN, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
House
01/19/2022
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/18/2022
Prefiled.