House | 02/23/2022 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2). | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Prefiled. |