Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to GVO/EDU, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Re-referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 14
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Re-referred to GVR, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 8
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Re-referred to AGR/GVR, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to AGR, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|