House | 02/11/2022 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Pending introduction. |