Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Act 002, 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Act 002, on 03/28/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 543).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, San Buenaventura . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kanuha). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-21-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|