House | 02/23/2022 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Pending introduction. |