House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HHH/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH/HET on Thursday, 02-17-22 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|