Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 766) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3924) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3236) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 118).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|