Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022