House
|
06/27/2022
|
Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tam, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Baker, Fevella, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 52-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 52-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Holt, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 2:15PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 906).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Holt Co-Chairs; Sayama.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 727) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3400) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Re-Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|