House
|
02/15/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|