LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1573
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB1573
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB1573
Action History
House
02/01/2022
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
01/27/2022
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
House
01/26/2022
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
House
01/21/2022
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/20/2022
Pending introduction.