House | 02/16/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Pending introduction. |