Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022