House
|
02/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|