Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1586 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022