Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 249).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott, McKelvey voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 775-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-25-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|