|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 932), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|