House | 02/23/2022 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kapela; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Pending introduction. |