House
|
02/15/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 340-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|