Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3364) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HTH, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 252).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Re-referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 10
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|