LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1639
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB1639
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB1639
Action History
House
02/08/2022
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/04/2022
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
House
01/26/2022
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
House
01/21/2022
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/20/2022
Pending introduction.