House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|