Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Re-Referred to AEN/EET, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha, Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN/EET added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Re-Referred to AEN/EET, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Hashem, Mizuno, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|