House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Takumi, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|