House | 02/09/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH. | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to CMV, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Pending introduction. |