House | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-04-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-22 9:30AM. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-02-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |