House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|