|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 191).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Tam voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Nakamura, Okimoto, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|