House | 02/16/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |