LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1716
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB1716
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB1716
Action History
House
02/15/2022
The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/11/2022
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
House
01/26/2022
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
House
01/24/2022
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/21/2022
Pending introduction.