Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Re-Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 259).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|