House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 086, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 086, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 744).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 514).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 716) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to HTH, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 31).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 693-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|