House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Branco, Matsumoto, Perruso, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Branco, Ganaden, Kapela, Matsumoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Tam voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 45-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|