Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|