House | 02/14/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ward excused (2). | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |