House
|
04/26/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 3:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Moriwaki, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Misalucha, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 788) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3880) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 264).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|