Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Act 027, 05/25/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2022
|
Act 027, on 05/25/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Tarnas, Nakashima, Branco, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 8:50AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Tarnas, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Branco, Perruso, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Gabbard, Acasio Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 789) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3933) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Re-Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to WTL/AEN/HWN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 36).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 502-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Ohno, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Marten, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Matayoshi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to AGR, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|