House | 02/24/2022 | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |