Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1775 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 12, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022