House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 137-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-04-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-22 9:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-02-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVR, HHH, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|