House | 02/10/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET. | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HHH, HET, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |