House
|
02/15/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EDN, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|