House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tokioka voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|