House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 549-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|